IA SF457 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the criminal and juvenile justice system by modifying criminal penalties, surcharges, fines, fees, and costs, creating and modifying funds, making appropriations and allocating revenues, modifying installment agreements, modifying civil claims for reimbursement, restitution, and collection of court debt, and providing effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1059 and SF 225.) Effective date: 06/25/2020, 07/15/2020, 01/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the criminal and juvenile justice system by modifying criminal penalties, surcharges, fines, fees, and costs, creating and modifying funds, making appropriations and allocating revenues, modifying installment agreements, modifying civil claims for reimbursement, restitution, and collection of court debt, and providing effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1059 and SF 225.) Effective date: 06/25/2020, 07/15/2020, 01/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 862. |
2020-06-24 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 862. |
2020-06-24 | House | Secretary's report on correction in enrollment. S.J. 864. |
2020-06-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 756. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 829. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 861. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 829. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5155. S.J. 828. |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5155. S.J. 816. |
2020-06-13 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 754. |
2020-06-13 | House | Passed House, yeas 77, nays 19. H.J. 754. |
2020-06-13 | House | Committee amendment H-8248 adopted, as amended. H.J. 753. |
2020-06-13 | House | Amendment H-8308 to committee amendment H-8248 adopted. H.J. 753. |
2020-06-13 | House | Amendment H-8308 to committee amendment H-8248 filed. H.J. 752. |
2020-06-13 | House | Amendment H-8292 to committee amendment H-8248 adopted. H.J. 752. |
2020-06-13 | House | Amendment H-8288 to committee amendment H-8248 adopted. H.J. 751. |
2020-06-13 | House | Committee amendment H-8148 withdrawn. H.J. 750. |
2020-06-11 | House | Amendments H-8288 and H-8292 filed. H.J. 712. |
2020-06-11 | House | Fiscal note. |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on Ways and Means calendar H.J. 690. |
2020-06-10 | House | Committee amendment H-8248 filed. H.J. 690. |
2020-06-10 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 690. |
2020-06-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-06-09 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Holt, Hein and Wolfe. H.J. 669. |
2020-06-09 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 06/10/2020 8:00AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2020-03-12 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Holt and Wolfe. H.J. 594. |
2020-03-11 | House | Pursuant to Rule 31.7, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 589. |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 589. |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee amendment H-8148 filed. H.J. 590. |
2020-03-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/04/2020 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-02-19 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Hite, Klein and Wolfe. H.J. 307. |
2019-04-27 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1077. |
2019-03-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/28/2019 8:15AM House Lounge. |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 624. |
2019-03-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-03-14 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/19/2019 8:15AM House Lounge. |
2019-03-13 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Kaufmann and Wolfe. H.J. 550. |
2019-03-13 | House | Fiscal note, as amended. |
2019-03-12 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 504. |
2019-03-11 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 494. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 540. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 1. S.J. 539. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 620. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Amendment S-3016 filed, adopted. S.J. 539. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 455. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 449. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1059 (Related) 2019-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF225 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 457. S.J. 455.
SF225 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 457. S.J. 455.