IA SF452 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 905.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 905.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act related to allowable annual salaries for deputy county auditors in charge of elections administration. (Formerly SSB 1153.)
Title
A bill for an act related to allowable annual salaries for deputy county auditors in charge of elections administration. (Formerly SSB 1153.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 905. |
2017-03-13 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 630. |
2017-03-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 625. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 572. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 570. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 481. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 475. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB113 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 495.
SSB1153 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF570 (Similar To) 2018-01-08 - Rereferred to State Government. H.J. 20.
SSB1153 (Related) 2017-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF570 (Similar To) 2018-01-08 - Rereferred to State Government. H.J. 20.