IA SF450 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the death of a dependent adult, and providing penalties. (Formerly SF 300.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the death of a dependent adult, and providing penalties. (Formerly SF 300.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-08 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1025. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1024. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 887. |
2021-04-14 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 961. |
2021-05-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1173. |
2021-04-22 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1000. |
2021-04-21 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 996. |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed House, yeas 92, nays none. H.J. 961. |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 920. |
2021-04-02 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 881. |
2021-03-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-03-29 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/31/2021 8:00AM House Lounge 1. |
2021-03-23 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Kaufmann and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 777. |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 760. |
2021-03-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 742. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 622. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 621. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 458. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 454. |
Same As/Similar To
SF300 (Similar To) 2021-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 450. S.J. 458.