IA SF447 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the individual income tax credits for fire fighters, emergency medical services personnel members, and reserve peace officers by increasing the amounts of the credits, and including retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the individual income tax credits for fire fighters, emergency medical services personnel members, and reserve peace officers by increasing the amounts of the credits, and including retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/18/2021 11:30AM RM 24A. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dickey, Dawson, and Jochum. S.J. 469. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 443. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF447 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF447.html |