IA SF445 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2021 1:00PM RM 24A.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2021 1:00PM RM 24A.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practice of interior design, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practice of interior design, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2021 1:00PM RM 24A. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Bisignano, and Koelker. S.J. 456. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 443. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB238 (Related) 2021-03-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 781.
HF781 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 622.
HF781 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 622.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF445 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF445.html |