IA SF443 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2303. S.J. 339.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2303. S.J. 339.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the inclusion of occupational therapists as mental health professionals for the purposes of disclosure of mental health and psychological information.(See SF 2303.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the inclusion of occupational therapists as mental health professionals for the purposes of disclosure of mental health and psychological information.(See SF 2303.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2303. S.J. 339. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2020 3:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Subcommittee: Costello, Bolkcom, and Carlin. S.J. 469. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 431. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2303 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 339.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF443 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF443.html |