IA SF442 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act related to guaranteed maximum price contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act related to guaranteed maximum price contracts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-01SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
2023-02-27SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2023 1:30PM Room 217 Conference Room.
2023-02-28SenateSubcommittee: Cournoyer, Jochum, and Webster. S.J. 439.
2023-02-27SenateIntroduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 423.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback