IA SF44 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 171. S.J. 176.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 171. S.J. 176.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to sexual misconduct by a peace officer with offenders and juveniles in the peace officer's custody and providing penalties.(See SF 171.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to sexual misconduct by a peace officer with offenders and juveniles in the peace officer's custody and providing penalties.(See SF 171.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 171. S.J. 176. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/20/2021 8:00AM RM 111. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Kinney, Johnson, and J. Taylor. S.J. 97. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 69. |
Same As/Similar To
SF171 (Similar To) 2021-04-01 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 726.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF44 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF44.html |