IA SF434 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Message from House, with amendment S-3329. S.J. 1045.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-18 - Message from House, with amendment S-3329. S.J. 1045.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the sealing of certain criminal offenders’ juvenile delinquency records. (Formerly SF 292.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the sealing of certain criminal offenders’ juvenile delinquency records. (Formerly SF 292.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3329. S.J. 1045. |
2017-04-17 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1035. |
2017-04-17 | House | Passed House, ayes 99, nays 0. H.J. 1032. |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee amendment H-1252 adopted, as amended. H.J. 1031. |
2017-04-17 | House | Amendment H-1298 to committee amendment H-1252 adopted. H.J. 1031. |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 905. |
2017-04-04 | House | Amendment H-1298 filed. H.J. 881. |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee amendment H-1252 filed. H.J. 823. |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 821. |
2017-03-22 | House | Subcommittee: Gustafson, Paustian and Wolfe. H.J. 757. |
2017-03-21 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 707. |
2017-03-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 705. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 700. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 787. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 28, nays 21. S.J. 700. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 470. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 468. |
Same As/Similar To
SF292 (Similar To) 2017-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.