IA SF421 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 657.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act prohibiting interference with the transportation of an agricultural animal, and providing penalties.(Formerly SSB 1166.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act prohibiting interference with the transportation of an agricultural animal, and providing penalties.(Formerly SSB 1166.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22SenateWithdrawn. S.J. 657.
2021-03-22SenateHF 655 substituted. S.J. 656.
2021-03-10SenateAttached to companion HF 655. S.J. 576.
2021-02-18SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 410.
2021-02-18SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 404.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1166 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 421.
HSB188 (Related) 2021-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 655.
HF655 (Similar To) 2021-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback