IA SF420 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to Transportation. S.J. 726.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to Transportation. S.J. 726.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to private land available for public use for recreational purposes.(Formerly SSB 1155.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to private land available for public use for recreational purposes.(Formerly SSB 1155.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation Report (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. S.J. 726. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3048 filed. S.J. 555. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 409. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 403. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1155 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 420.
HSB205 (Related) 2021-02-25 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
HSB205 (Related) 2021-02-25 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0