IA SF42 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-26 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa core curriculum and to assessment and content standards for school districts and accredited nonpublic schools and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa core curriculum and to assessment and content standards for school districts and accredited nonpublic schools and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2021 11:30AM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Celsi, and Johnson. S.J. 111. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 27. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF42 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF42.html |