IA SF42 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to jurisdictional changes to small claims court cases. (See SF 2357.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to jurisdictional changes to small claims court cases. (See SF 2357.)
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Garrett, Boulton, and Zaun. S.J. 276. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Boulton, and Schneider. S.J. 76. |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 60. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2357 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Subcommittee: McKean, Gustafson and Lensing. H.J. 515.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF42 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF42.html |