IA SF394 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - Message from House, with amendment S-3128. S.J. 884.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-16 - Message from House, with amendment S-3128. S.J. 884.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to responsibilities for expenses for the safekeeping and maintenance of prisoners by counties and cities. (Formerly SF 238.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to responsibilities for expenses for the safekeeping and maintenance of prisoners by counties and cities. (Formerly SF 238.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - Passed House (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3128. S.J. 884. |
2015-04-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 862. |
2015-04-21 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 895. |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed House, ayes 87, nays 5. H.J. 848. |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendments H-1160, H-1161, H-1164, and H-1206 out of order. H.J. 848. |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment H-1205 adopted. H.J. 848. |
2015-04-15 | House | Substituted for HF 528. H.J. 847. |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 814. |
2015-04-07 | House | Amendments H-1205 and H-1206 filed. H.J. 791. |
2015-03-30 | House | Amendment H-1164 filed. H.J. 730. |
2015-03-27 | House | Amendments H-1160 and H-1161 filed. H.J. 724. |
2015-03-17 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 621. |
2015-03-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 616. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 617. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 616. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3029 adopted. S.J. 615. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Amendment S-3029 filed. S.J. 555. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 446. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 440. |