IA SF392 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-27 - Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to sexual misconduct by a peace officer with offenders and juveniles in the peace officer's custody, and providing penalties. (Formerly SF 258.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to sexual misconduct by a peace officer with offenders and juveniles in the peace officer's custody, and providing penalties. (Formerly SF 258.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-27 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076. |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 843. |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 758. |
2019-04-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-04-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/02/2019 10:30AM House Lounge. |
2019-03-28 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Bennett and Klein. H.J. 689. |
2019-03-28 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 674. |
2019-03-28 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 672. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 766. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 765. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 411. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 403. |
Same As/Similar To
SF258 (Similar To) 2019-02-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 392. S.J. 411.