IA SF389 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Hearing: Jan 21 @ 2:00 pm in RM 24
Hearing: Jan 21 @ 4:00 pm in RM 24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the operation of motor vehicles in the left-most lane of certain roadways, and making penalties applicable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the operation of motor vehicles in the left-most lane of certain roadways, and making penalties applicable.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2020-01-14SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/15/2020 11:00AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
2020-01-14SenateSubcommittee reassigned: Whiting, Koelker, and T. Taylor. S.J. 68.
2019-04-27SenateReferred to Transportation. S.J. 1191.
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857.
2019-03-14SenateFiscal note.
2019-03-05SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 472.
2019-02-27SenateSubcommittee: Koelker, Brown, and Kinney. S.J. 419.
2019-02-26SenateIntroduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 403.

Same As/Similar To

HF74 (Similar To) 2019-02-20 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 334.
HF481 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Transportation. H.J. 1076.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback