IA SF374 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Withdrawn. S.J. 906.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Withdrawn. S.J. 906.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the authority of county boards of supervisors to amend an agreement between the counties to implement the county land record information system.(Formerly SSB 1167.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the authority of county boards of supervisors to amend an agreement between the counties to implement the county land record information system.(Formerly SSB 1167.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government Report (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 906. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | HF 527 substituted. S.J. 905. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 527. S.J. 765. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 726. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 361. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 354. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB96 (Related) 2021-02-11 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 386.
SSB1167 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 374.
HF527 (Similar To) 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1210.
SSB1167 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 374.
HF527 (Similar To) 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1210.