IA SF374 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1125.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to providing legal assistance to indigent persons in criminal proceedings, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1023.) Various effective dates; see section 7 of bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to providing legal assistance to indigent persons in criminal proceedings, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1023.) Various effective dates; see section 7 of bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-21HouseSigned by Governor. S.J. 1125.
2017-04-18HouseSent to Governor. S.J. 1061.
2017-04-18HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1061.
2017-04-11HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 978.
2017-04-11SenateImmediate message. S.J. 965.
2017-04-11SenatePassed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 961.
2017-04-11SenateSenate concurred with S-3293. S.J. 960.
2017-04-07SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-3293. S.J. 929.
2017-04-06HouseImmediate message. H.J. 918.
2017-04-06HousePassed House, ayes 93, nays 1. H.J. 911.
2017-04-06HouseCommittee amendment H-1214 adopted, as amended. H.J. 911.
2017-04-06HouseAmendment H-1304 to committee amendment H-1214 adopted. H.J. 911.
2017-04-06HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 905.
2017-04-05HouseAmendment H-1304 filed. H.J. 898.
2017-03-16HouseCommittee amendment H-1214 filed. H.J. 681.
2017-03-16HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 680.
2017-03-08HouseSubcommittee: Baltimore, Meyer and Paustian. H.J. 564.
2017-03-07HouseRead first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 542.
2017-03-07HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 520.
2017-03-07SenateImmediate message. S.J. 500.
2017-03-07SenatePassed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 500.
2017-02-28SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 428.
2017-02-28SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 422.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback