IA SF367 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain financial obligations, including under the consumer credit code, and including under the criminal and juvenile justice system by modifying criminal and civil surcharges, fines, fees, costs, and court debt, providing civil penalties, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1146.) Effective date: Enactment, 01/01/2022, 07/01/2021. Applicability date: 07/15/2020.
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain financial obligations, including under the consumer credit code, and including under the criminal and juvenile justice system by modifying criminal and civil surcharges, fines, fees, costs, and court debt, providing civil penalties, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1146.) Effective date: Enactment, 01/01/2022, 07/01/2021. Applicability date: 07/15/2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1150. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1149. |
2021-05-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1118. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1070. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 1149. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0. S.J. 1069. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3200. S.J. 1068. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3200. S.J. 1049. |
2021-05-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1095. |
2021-05-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1174. |
2021-05-17 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1139. |
2021-05-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1101. |
2021-05-07 | House | Passed House, yeas 86, nays none. H.J. 1083. |
2021-05-07 | House | Amendment H-1412 adopted. H.J. 1083. |
2021-04-26 | House | Amendment H-1412 filed. H.J. 1003. |
2021-04-22 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1001. |
2021-04-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-04-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/14/2021 8:00AM House Lounge 1. |
2021-04-07 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Mitchell and Wolfe. H.J. 916. |
2021-04-02 | House | Pursuant to Rule 31.7, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 881. |
2021-04-02 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 881. |
2021-03-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-03-08 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/09/2021 8:45AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2021-03-01 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Mitchell and Wolfe. H.J. 566. |
2021-03-01 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 561. |
2021-03-01 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 528. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 431. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 431. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Amendment S-3035 filed, adopted. S.J. 430. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 351. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 346. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1146 (Related) 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 367.