IA SF363 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 553. S.J. 596.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to special deer hunting licenses available to nonresident family members.(Formerly SF 277; See SF 553.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to special deer hunting licenses available to nonresident family members.(Formerly SF 277; See SF 553.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources And Environment Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Natural Resources And Environment Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-16SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 553. S.J. 596.
2023-03-09SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
2023-03-07SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 03/09/2023 9:30AM Room 315.
2023-03-01SenateSubcommittee: Driscoll, Dickey, and Dotzler. S.J. 450.
2023-02-28SenateReferred to Ways and Means. S.J. 430.
2023-02-22SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 398.
2023-02-22SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 388.

Same As/Similar To

SF277 (Similar To) 2023-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 363. S.J. 398.
SF553 (Similar To) 2024-01-09 - Subcommittee: Driscoll, Dickey, and Dotzler. S.J. 61.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback