IA SF361 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the temporary delegation of parental authority by the parent, guardian, or legal custodian of a child. (Formerly SF 78.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the temporary delegation of parental authority by the parent, guardian, or legal custodian of a child. (Formerly SF 78.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671.
2018-03-21HouseAmendment H-8309 filed. H.J. 654.
2018-03-15HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 596.
2018-03-08HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2018-03-08HouseSubcommittee reassigned: McKean, Hein and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 549.
2017-03-28HouseSubcommittee: McKean, Nunn and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 804.
2017-03-23HouseRead first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 760.
2017-03-22HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 755.
2017-03-22SenateImmediate message. S.J. 726.
2017-03-27SenateExplanation of vote. S.J. 787.
2017-03-22SenatePassed Senate, ayes 47, nays 2. S.J. 724.
2017-02-27SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 415.
2017-02-27SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 412.

Same As/Similar To

SF78 (Similar To) 2017-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback