IA SF354 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Rereferred to State Government. H.J. 1203.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Rereferred to State Government. H.J. 1203.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to continuing education requirements for persons holding certain professional and occupational licenses. (Formerly SF 163.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to continuing education requirements for persons holding certain professional and occupational licenses. (Formerly SF 163.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Rereferred to State Government. H.J. 1203. |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 919. |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee amendment H-1288 filed. H.J. 833. |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 831. |
2021-03-15 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/16/2021 12:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2021-03-11 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/16/2021 11:30AM House Lounge. |
2021-03-10 | House | Subcommittee: Lundgren, Bossman and Donahue. H.J. 700. |
2021-02-18 | House | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 474. |
2021-02-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 444. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 383. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 383. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Amendment S-3024 adopted. S.J. 382. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Amendment S-3024 filed. S.J. 362. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 339. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 330. |
Same As/Similar To
SF163 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 354. S.J. 339.