IA SF344 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-11 - Subcommittee: Green, Lofgren, and Weiner. S.J. 96.
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to repayment of governmental subdivision loans for disaster aid.(Formerly SF 137.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to repayment of governmental subdivision loans for disaster aid.(Formerly SF 137.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Local Government Report (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Report (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-11SenateSubcommittee: Green, Lofgren, and Weiner. S.J. 96.
2023-06-05SenateReferred to Local Government. S.J. 1091.
2023-03-30SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 721.
2023-03-07SenateAmendment S-3053 filed. S.J. 541.
2023-02-27SenateFiscal note.
2023-02-22SenateAttached to HF 280. S.J. 379.
2023-02-21SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 374.
2023-02-21SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 366.

Same As/Similar To

SF137 (Similar To) 2023-02-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 344. S.J. 374.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback