IA SF34 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act providing an exemption from the computation of the individual income tax of certain amounts of retirement income and including retroactive applicability provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act providing an exemption from the computation of the individual income tax of certain amounts of retirement income and including retroactive applicability provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-13SenateFiscal note.
2017-01-19SenateSubcommittee reassigned: Feenstra, Brown, and Dotzler. S.J. 106.
2017-01-12SenateSubcommittee: Brown, Dotzler, and Feenstra. S.J. 84.
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 59.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback