IA SF34 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-13 - Subcommittee reassigned, Rielly, Heckroth, and Reynolds. S.J. 65.

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the operation of bicycles on a street or highway, providing requirements for motor vehicle operators encountering other vehicles or bicycles, and providing penalties. (See SF 117.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the operation of bicycles on a street or highway, providing requirements for motor vehicle operators encountering other vehicles or bicycles, and providing penalties. (See SF 117.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-01-13 Subcommittee reassigned, Rielly, Heckroth, and Reynolds. S.J. 65.
2010-01-07 * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
2009-01-27 Subcommittee, McCoy, Beall, and Reynolds. S.J. 148.
2009-01-26 Introduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 126.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback