IA SF339 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 621.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 621.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the employment of unauthorized aliens and providing penalties.(Formerly SF 84.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the employment of unauthorized aliens and providing penalties.(Formerly SF 84.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 0 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 0 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 621. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 194. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2022 1:00PM Room G15. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Kinney, and Schultz. S.J. 79. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 726. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 334. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 327. |
Same As/Similar To
SF84 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 339. S.J. 334.