IA SF336 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act requiring that regents universities and community colleges waive a percentage of the tuition and mandatory fees for children of veterans with service-connected disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act requiring that regents universities and community colleges waive a percentage of the tuition and mandatory fees for children of veterans with service-connected disabilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-28SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
2023-02-23SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2023 8:30AM Room 217 Conference Room.
2023-02-22SenateSubcommittee: Salmon, Garrett, and Giddens. S.J. 394.
2023-02-20SenateIntroduced, referred to Education. S.J. 359.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback