IA SF333 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 938.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 938.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to authorized emergency vehicles, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 72.) Effective date: 05/24/2022. Applicability date: 05/24/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to authorized emergency vehicles, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 72.) Effective date: 05/24/2022. Applicability date: 05/24/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 54 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 54 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 938. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 938. |
2022-04-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 847. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 764. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 33, nays 16. S.J. 764. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5123. S.J. 764. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5123. S.J. 751. |
2022-04-12 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 839. |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed House, yeas 54, nays 39. H.J. 836. |
2022-04-12 | House | Amendment H-8354 adopted. H.J. 836. |
2022-04-11 | House | Amendment H-8354 filed. H.J. 826. |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 645. |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on calendar. H.J. 597. |
2022-03-16 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 597. |
2022-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-02-23 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2022 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2022-02-22 | House | Subcommittee: Kerr, Paustian and Steckman. H.J. 346. |
2022-01-24 | House | Rereferred to Public Safety. H.J. 110. |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to Transportation. H.J. 965. |
2021-03-30 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 870. |
2021-03-29 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 867. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 695. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 31, nays 14. S.J. 693. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 340. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 326. |
Same As/Similar To
SF72 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 333. S.J. 340.