IA SF330 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 487. S.J. 470.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to special elections to fill vacancies in county boards of supervisors and city elective offices, and including applicability provisions.(See SF 487.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to special elections to fill vacancies in county boards of supervisors and city elective offices, and including applicability provisions.(See SF 487.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-02SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 487. S.J. 470.
2023-02-22SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2023-02-21SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2023 10:00AM Room 315.
2023-02-22SenateSubcommittee: Webster, Bisignano, and Driscoll. S.J. 393.
2023-02-20SenateIntroduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 357.

Same As/Similar To

SF487 (Similar To) 2023-06-05 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 1092.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback