IA SF330 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2141. S.J. 172.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2141. S.J. 172.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use of an electronic device in a voice-activated or hands-free mode while driving, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly SF 46; See SF 2141.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use of an electronic device in a voice-activated or hands-free mode while driving, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly SF 46; See SF 2141.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2141. S.J. 172. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2022 11:00AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Brown, and Giddens. S.J. 98. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. S.J. 1148. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 726. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 339. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 326. |
Same As/Similar To
SF46 (Similar To) 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 330. S.J. 339.
HF75 (Similar To) 2021-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 392.
HF392 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2129.
HF2129 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Fiscal note.
SF2141 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Referred to Transportation. S.J. 621.
HF75 (Similar To) 2021-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 392.
HF392 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2129.
HF2129 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Fiscal note.
SF2141 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Referred to Transportation. S.J. 621.