IA SF329 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Placed on calendar H.J. 514.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Placed on calendar H.J. 514.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to expert witness testimony in child sexual abuse and child endangerment cases. (Formerly SSB 1016.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to expert witness testimony in child sexual abuse and child endangerment cases. (Formerly SSB 1016.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Placed on calendar H.J. 514. |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 514. |
2020-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/26/2020 11:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-02-24 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Klein and Meyer, B.. H.J. 350. |
2019-04-27 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076. |
2019-04-09 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 769. |
2019-04-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 769. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 902. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 899. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 366. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 360. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1016 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB19 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 467.
HF686 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.
HSB19 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 467.
HF686 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Judiciary. H.J. 1076.