IA SF318 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1086.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to apprenticeships and establishing an Iowa office of apprenticeship and Iowa apprenticeship council. (Formerly SSB 1086.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to apprenticeships and establishing an Iowa office of apprenticeship and Iowa apprenticeship council. (Formerly SSB 1086.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-20 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3171 to House amendment S–3164 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3171 to House amendment S–3164 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - House - Shall amendment H–1266 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-04-19 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - Shall amendment H–1266 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Workforce Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3171 to House amendment S–3164 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3171 to House amendment S–3164 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Workforce Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-10SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 1086.
2023-05-08SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1085.
2023-04-24HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 903.
2023-04-20SenateImmediate message. S.J. 915.
2023-04-20SenatePassed Senate, yeas 34, nays 15. S.J. 914.
2023-04-20SenateSenate concurred with S-3164. S.J. 914.
2023-04-20SenateAmendment S-3171 filed, lost. S.J. 913.
2023-04-19SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-3164. S.J. 859.
2023-04-19HouseImmediate message. H.J. 886.
2023-04-20HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 901.
2023-04-19HousePassed House, yeas 62, nays 33. H.J. 872.
2023-04-19HouseAmendment H-1264 filed, adopted. H.J. 872.
2023-04-19HouseAmendment H-1266, yeas 33, nays 62, filed, lost. H.J. 871.
2023-04-19HouseSubstituted for HF 639. H.J. 871.
2023-03-15HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 651.
2023-03-15HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 649.
2023-03-15SenateImmediate message. S.J. 584.
2023-03-15SenatePassed Senate, yeas 35, nays 13. S.J. 583.
2023-03-15SenateAmendment S-3081 filed, adopted. S.J. 583.
2023-02-16SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 353.
2023-02-16SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 351.

Same As/Similar To

HSB82 (Related) 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 639.
SSB1086 (Related) 2023-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 318.
HF639 (Similar To) 2023-04-19 - Withdrawn. H.J. 886.

Iowa State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF318
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF318.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGR/90/attachments/SF318.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGE/90/attachments/SF318.html
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20230216_SJNL.pdf#354
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20230315_SJNL.pdf#583
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20230419_HJNL.pdf#871
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20230419_HJNL.pdf#872
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20230420_SJNL.pdf#913
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20230420_SJNL.pdf#914
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20230315_SJNL.pdf#582
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20230419_HJNL.pdf#870
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20230420_SJNL.pdf#912
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/1445225.pdf#354
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/1445225.pdf#912
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/1445225.pdf#582
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/1445225.pdf#914
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/1445225.pdf#913
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/1445225.pdf#583

Bill Comments

feedback