IA SF315 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to reporting requirements concerning the department of administrative services. (Formerly SSB 1120.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to reporting requirements concerning the department of administrative services. (Formerly SSB 1120.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1024. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1024. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 840. |
2021-04-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 910. |
2021-05-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1173. |
2021-04-21 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 996. |
2021-04-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 951. |
2021-04-07 | House | Passed House, yeas 90, nays 1. H.J. 907. |
2021-03-23 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 778. |
2021-03-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-03-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/22/2021 11:45AM House Lounge. |
2021-03-10 | House | Subcommittee: Nordman, Bacon and Hunter. H.J. 700. |
2021-02-18 | House | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 474. |
2021-02-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 444. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 383. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 378. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 316. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 309. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB126 (Related) 2021-01-27 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2021 8:30AM House Lounge.
SSB1120 (Related) 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 315.
SSB1120 (Related) 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 315.