IA SF30 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2019 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-29 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2019 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa core curriculum and to assessment and content standards for school districts and accredited nonpublic schools and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the Iowa core curriculum and to assessment and content standards for school districts and accredited nonpublic schools and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2019 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2019 11:00AM RM 315. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Kraayenbrink, and Quirmbach. S.J. 125. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 84. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF30 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF30.html |