IA SF296 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1140.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1140.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the practice of pharmacy, including the prescription and administration of vaccines and collaborative pharmacy practice. (Formerly SSB 1095.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the practice of pharmacy, including the prescription and administration of vaccines and collaborative pharmacy practice. (Formerly SSB 1095.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1140. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1140. |
2021-04-28 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1023. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 970. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 967. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3144. S.J. 967. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3144. S.J. 841. |
2021-04-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 910. |
2021-05-18 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1173. |
2021-04-21 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 996. |
2021-04-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 951. |
2021-04-07 | House | Passed House, yeas 89, nays 2. H.J. 905. |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment H-1350 adopted. H.J. 904. |
2021-04-07 | House | Substituted for HF 794. H.J. 904. |
2021-04-06 | House | Amendment H-1350 filed. H.J. 895. |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 759. |
2021-03-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 741. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 614. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 611. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 303. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 294. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB91 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 794.
SSB1095 (Related) 2021-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 296.
HF794 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 910.
SSB1095 (Related) 2021-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 296.
HF794 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 910.