IA SF292 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 498. S.J. 474.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to writing fees required for certain all-terrain vehicle, snowmobile, and water vessel transactions completed by a county recorder.(See SF 498.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to writing fees required for certain all-terrain vehicle, snowmobile, and water vessel transactions completed by a county recorder.(See SF 498.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-02SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 498. S.J. 474.
2023-02-27SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2023-02-22SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2023 1:30PM Room 315.
2023-02-22SenateSubcommittee reassigned: Webster, Bennett, and De Witt. S.J. 393.
2023-02-15SenateSubcommittee: Webster, De Witt, and Winckler. S.J. 342.
2023-02-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 335.

Same As/Similar To

SF498 (Similar To) 2023-03-14 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback