IA SF290 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 521. S.J. 511.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to goose hunting on private property. (See SF 521.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to goose hunting on private property. (See SF 521.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 521. S.J. 511.
2019-02-26SenateSubcommittee: Cournoyer, Behn, and Boulton. S.J. 406.
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 326.

Same As/Similar To

SF521 (Similar To) 2019-03-28 - Read first time, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 675.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback