IA SF281 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act exempting from the state sales and use tax the sales price of elk, game birds, preserve whitetail, and ungulates sold to a hunting preserve.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act exempting from the state sales and use tax the sales price of elk, game birds, preserve whitetail, and ungulates sold to a hunting preserve.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
2023-03-21SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 03/22/2023 11:30AM Room 315.
2023-02-15SenateSubcommittee: Cournoyer, Brown, and Dotzler. S.J. 342.
2023-02-14SenateIntroduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 320.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback