IA SF279 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Reported out of committee as SF 599. S.J. 711.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to hemp, including the regulation of hemp, providing for enforcement and the confiscation and destruction or disposal of certain property, providing for fees, making appropriations, including penalties, and providing implementation and effective date provisions. (See SF 599.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to hemp, including the regulation of hemp, providing for enforcement and the confiscation and destruction or disposal of certain property, providing for fees, making appropriations, including penalties, and providing implementation and effective date provisions. (See SF 599.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateReported out of committee as SF 599. S.J. 711.
2019-03-05SenateFiscal note.
2019-02-21SenateSubcommittee: Brown, Behn, and Wahls. S.J. 389.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Ways and Means. S.J. 369.
2019-02-20SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 363.
2019-02-18SenateSubcommittee: Shipley, Kapucian, Kinney, Wahls, and Zumbach. S.J. 330.
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, referred to Agriculture. S.J. 324.

Same As/Similar To

SF599 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1197.
HF763 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 753.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback