IA SF254 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 805.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Withdrawn. S.J. 805.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the forfeiture of bail.(Formerly SSB 1038.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the forfeiture of bail.(Formerly SSB 1038.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 805. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | HF 424 substituted. S.J. 804. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 725. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 424. S.J. 366. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 265. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 259. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1038 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 254.