IA SF246 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 388. S.J. 394.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-17 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 388. S.J. 394.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain civil and criminal enforcement activities involving the practice of massage therapy and cosmetology, and human trafficking, and providing penalties.(See SF 388.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain civil and criminal enforcement activities involving the practice of massage therapy and cosmetology, and human trafficking, and providing penalties.(See SF 388.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 388. S.J. 394. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2021 12:30PM RM 24A. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Kinney, and Sinclair. S.J. 299. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 248. |
Same As/Similar To
SF388 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Withdrawn. S.J. 746.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF246 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF246.html |