IA SF2433 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 963.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 963.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations for state government administration and regulation, including the department of administrative services, auditor of state, ethics and campaign disclosure board, offices of governor and lieutenant governor, department of inspections, appeals, and licensing, department of insurance and financial services, department of management, Iowa public employees' retirement system, public information board, department of revenue, secretary of state, treasurer of state, and utilities board. (Formerly SSB 3199.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations for state government administration and regulation, including the department of administrative services, auditor of state, ethics and campaign disclosure board, offices of governor and lieutenant governor, department of inspections, appeals, and licensing, department of insurance and financial services, department of management, Iowa public employees' retirement system, public information board, department of revenue, secretary of state, treasurer of state, and utilities board. (Formerly SSB 3199.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 56 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5195 to amendment S–5192 be adopted? (Y: 13 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-18 - House - Shall amendment H–8370 be adopted? (Y: 38 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 31 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Shall amendment S–5195 to amendment S–5192 be adopted? (Y: 13 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-18 - House - Shall amendment H–8370 be adopted? (Y: 38 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 963. |
2024-05-07 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 961. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 898. |
2024-04-18 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2024-04-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 869. |
2024-04-18 | House | Passed House, yeas 56, nays 35. H.J. 868. |
2024-04-18 | House | Amendment H-8370, yeas 38, nays 53, filed, lost. H.J. 867. |
2024-04-18 | House | Substituted for HF 2696. H.J. 867. |
2024-04-18 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 849. |
2024-04-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 847. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 887. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 31, nays 13. S.J. 887. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Amendment S-5192 adopted. S.J. 886. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Amendment S-5195 filed, lost. S.J. 886. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Amendment S-5192 filed. S.J. 886. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 749. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 747. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3199 (Related) 2024-04-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2433.
HF2696 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 870.
HF2696 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 870.