IA SF2415 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 807.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to transportation and other infrastructure- related appropriations to the department of transportation, including allocation and use of moneys from the road use tax fund and the primary road fund and other related provisions, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 3203.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to transportation and other infrastructure- related appropriations to the department of transportation, including allocation and use of moneys from the road use tax fund and the primary road fund and other related provisions, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 3203.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-13SenateWithdrawn. S.J. 807.
2020-06-13SenateHF 2644 substituted. S.J. 806.
2020-06-13SenateAmendment S-5147 adopted. S.J. 806.
2020-06-13SenateAttached to similar HF 2644. S.J. 804.
2020-06-12SenateAmendment S-5147 filed. S.J. 802.
2020-06-11SenateNOBA: Senate Full Approps
2020-06-11SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 780.
2020-06-11SenateIntroduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 779.

Same As/Similar To

HSB711 (Related) 2020-06-10 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 690.
HF2644 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 788.
SSB3203 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2415.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback