IA SF2411 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1010.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1010.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the judicial branch. (Formerly SSB 3215.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the judicial branch. (Formerly SSB 3215.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 1010. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | HF 2495 substituted. S.J. 1009. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Amendment S-5277 filed, adopted. S.J. 1009. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 2495. S.J. 1000. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 983. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 982. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB693 (Related) 2018-04-17 - NOBA: House Sub
HF2495 (Similar To) 2018-06-01 - NOBA: Graybook
SSB3215 (Related) 2018-04-26 - NOBA: Senate Sub
HF2495 (Similar To) 2018-06-01 - NOBA: Graybook
SSB3215 (Related) 2018-04-26 - NOBA: Senate Sub
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2411 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2411.html |