IA SF2396 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-13 - Withdrawn. S.J. 819.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the rulemaking process for executive branch agencies and including transition provisions. (Formerly SSB 3191.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the rulemaking process for executive branch agencies and including transition provisions. (Formerly SSB 3191.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-13SenateWithdrawn. S.J. 819.
2020-06-13SenateHF 2389 substituted. S.J. 818.
2020-03-03SenateAttached to companion HF 2389. S.J. 500.
2020-03-02SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 484.
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 482.

Same As/Similar To

HSB568 (Related) 2020-02-11 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 254.
HF2389 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 790.
SSB3191 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2396. S.J. 484.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback