IA SF2392 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Bloomingdale and Mascher. H.J. 588.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Bloomingdale and Mascher. H.J. 588.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the operation of state government, including the review of state boards, the regulation of professions and occupations, and investigations conducted by state boards, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3142.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the operation of state government, including the review of state boards, the regulation of professions and occupations, and investigations conducted by state boards, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3142.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Bloomingdale and Mascher. H.J. 588. |
2020-03-11 | House | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 573. |
2020-03-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 536. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 561. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 30, nays 18. S.J. 560. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5053 adopted, as amended. S.J. 560. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Amendment S-5054 adopted. S.J. 560. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5054 to S-5053 filed. S.J. 534. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Amendment S-5053 filed. S.J. 504. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 405. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 396. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3142 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2392.