IA SF2389 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 809.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 809.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to commercial transactions, including control and transmission of electronic records and digital assets. (Formerly SF 540, SSB 1177.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Title
A bill for an act relating to commercial transactions, including control and transmission of electronic records and digital assets. (Formerly SF 540, SSB 1177.) Effective date: 07/01/2024.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 809. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 808. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Secretary's report on correction in enrollment. S.J. 632. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 606. |
2024-03-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 632. |
2024-03-20 | House | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 632. |
2024-03-20 | House | Substituted for HF 2519. H.J. 631. |
2024-02-22 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 366. |
2024-02-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 342. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 366. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 365. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Amendment S-5020 filed, adopted. S.J. 365. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 338. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 334. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1177 (Related) 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 540.
HSB195 (Related) 2023-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 618.
HF618 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 633.
SF540 (Similar To) 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2389. S.J. 338.
HF2519 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 633.
HSB195 (Related) 2023-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 618.
HF618 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 633.
SF540 (Similar To) 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2389. S.J. 338.
HF2519 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Withdrawn. H.J. 633.