IA SF2382 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Amendments S-5060, S-5061, and S-5063 filed. S.J. 534.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Amendments S-5060, S-5061, and S-5063 filed. S.J. 534.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing the offense of sexual activity with an individual sixteen or seventeen years of age, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 3081.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing the offense of sexual activity with an individual sixteen or seventeen years of age, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 3081.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Amendments S-5060, S-5061, and S-5063 filed. S.J. 534. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 402. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 394. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3081 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2382.
HF2248 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Fiscal note.
HF2248 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Fiscal note.