IA SF2381 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1075.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1075.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making transportation and other infrastructure-related appropriations to the department of transportation, including allocation and use of moneys from the road use tax fund and the primary road fund, providing for properly related matters, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3252.) Effective 7-1-10.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making transportation and other infrastructure-related appropriations to the department of transportation, including allocation and use of moneys from the road use tax fund and the primary road fund, providing for properly related matters, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 3252.) Effective 7-1-10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1075. | |
2010-03-30 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-30 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-25 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1268. | |
2010-03-25 | Immediate message. S.J. 984. | |
2010-03-25 | Passed Senate, ayes 29, nays 18. S.J. 983. | |
2010-03-25 | Senate concurred with S-5320. S.J. 982. | |
2010-03-24 | Message from House, with amendment S-5320. S.J. 968. | |
2010-03-24 | Immediate message. H.J. 1191. | |
2010-03-24 | Passed House, ayes 53, nays 46. H.J. 1190. | |
2010-03-24 | Amendment H-8514 as amended, adopted. H.J. 1190. | |
2010-03-24 | Amendment H-8567 filed, adopted. H.J. 1189. | |
2010-03-24 | Asked and received unanimous consent to reconsider the vote on H-8514. H.J. 1189. | |
2010-03-24 | Amendment H-8566 adopted. H.J. 1189. | |
2010-03-24 | Amendment H-8566 filed. H.J. 1188. | |
2010-03-24 | Amendment H-8563 lost. H.J. 1188. | |
2010-03-23 | Amendment H-8563 filed. H.J. 1185. | |
2010-03-23 | Deferred, retained on calendar. H.J. 1165. | |
2010-03-23 | Amendment H-8514 adopted. H.J. 1165. | |
2010-03-23 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1163. | |
2010-03-19 | Amendment H-8514 filed. H.J. 1124. | |
2010-03-19 | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 1069. | |
2010-03-18 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1025. | |
2010-03-18 | Immediate message. S.J. 901. | |
2010-03-18 | Passed Senate, ayes 31, nays 16. S.J. 899. | |
2010-03-18 | Amendment S-5286 out of order. S.J. 899. | |
2010-03-18 | Point of order raised S-5286. S.J. 899. | |
2010-03-18 | Amendment S-5286 filed. S.J. 899. | |
2010-03-17 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 886. | |
2010-03-17 | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 885. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0949B&ga=83 |