IA SF2380 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 700.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-05 - Withdrawn. S.J. 700.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the manufacture, sale, and consumption of certain products containing hemp, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3173.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the manufacture, sale, and consumption of certain products containing hemp, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3173.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 700. |
2020-06-05 | Senate | HF 2581 substituted. S.J. 700. |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Amendment S-5101 adopted. S.J. 699. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5101 filed. S.J. 686. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 2581. S.J. 590. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 401. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 394. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3173 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2380.
HF2432 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 290.
HF2432 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 290.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF2380 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF2380.html |